Granville v. QEP Energy Company et al
Plaintiff: Sean A. Granville
Defendant: QEP Energy Company and Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00098
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by QEP Energy Company. (cjs)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (cjs)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (cjs)
June 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Stock on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Stock, Robert)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to QEP Energy Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/30/2020. (cjs)
June 15, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 NOTICE (Other). Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL at #10 . (js)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QEP Energy Company from Dunn County District Court filed by QEP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Removal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.)(js)
June 11, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Administration Record. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM at #9 . (js)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE by QEP Energy Company of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Consent to Removal by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.)(Hughes, John) Modified on 6/15/2020 to restrict access. (js)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Sean A. Granville. (js)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* Administrative Record by Sean A. Granville re #2 Notice of Direct Assignment. (Weikum, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/11/2020 to restrict access. (js)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by QEP Energy Company. (Hughes, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of QEP Energy Company (Hughes, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QEP Energy Company identifying Corporate Parent QEP Resources, Inc. for QEP Energy Company.. (Hughes, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to QEP Energy Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/16/2020. (cjs)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sean A. Granville. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/16/2020. (cjs)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QEP Energy Company from Dunn County District Court, no case number assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000751 filed by QEP Energy Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Summons, Complaint and Demand for Jury)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granville v. QEP Energy Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QEP Energy Company
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Jordan B. Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean A. Granville
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?