Energy Equity Company v. Complete Energy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Energy Equity Company
Defendant: Complete Energy Services, Inc. and Complete Energy Services, Inc. doing business as Hamm & Phillips Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv00100
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/7/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (5 days) (JS)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/13/2020 to remove empty page) (am). NEF regenerated on 7/13/2020 (am).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/5/2021. Discovery Motions due by 5/5/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/14/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/14/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/12/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 7/12/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/16/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 1/8/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/8/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 6/18/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2021. (JS)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 7/13/2020. (JS)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Complete Energy Services, Inc.. (Zuger, Jack)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge to the case. (cjs)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Complete Energy Services, Inc.. (cjs)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Energy Equity Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/18/2020. (rh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Complete Energy Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/18/2020. (rh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Complete Energy Services, Inc. from Stark Co. District Court, case number 45-2020-cv-00387. Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000754 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stark Co. filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Equity Company v. Complete Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jack E. Zuger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Energy Services, Inc. doing business as Hamm & Phillips Services
Represented By: Jack E. Zuger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Equity Company
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?