Powers v. Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Powers
Defendant: Ross Kovach, Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc. and Jere Kovach
Case Number: 1:2020cv00101
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Jere Kovach, Ross Kovach, Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc..(King, Lawrence)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Powers. Jere Kovach served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020 (Sanford, Josh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Powers. Ross Kovach served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020 (Sanford, Josh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Powers. Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc. served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020 (Sanford, Josh)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jere Kovach, Ross Kovach, Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc.. (cjs)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jere Kovach, Ross Kovach, Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000765) filed by Kevin Powers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent of Kevin Powers)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers v. Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Powers
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Kovach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossco Crane & Rigging, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jere Kovach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?