Owan et al v. Equinor Energy, LP
Plaintiff: William Owan and Phyllis Owan
Defendant: Equinor Energy, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00116
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Modified on 8/26/2020 to remove text-only language.(js)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 12/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (4 days). (BG)
August 18, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Join Additional Parties due by 11/13/2020. (cjs)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/4/2021. Discovery Motions due by 6/4/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 7/2/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/6/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 9/17/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 11/13/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 2/12/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Threshold Motions due by 9/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2021. (BG) Modified on 8/18/2020 to correct due date for joining additional parties. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 8/18/2020. (BG)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Phyllis Owan, William Owan. (cjs)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/27/2020. (cjs)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Phyllis Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/27/2020. (cjs)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Equinor Energy, LP. (cjs)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
July 9, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Answer to Complaint. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) at #7 . (cjs)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Equinor Energy, LP. (cjs)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ANSWER to Complaint by Equinor Energy, LP.(Huckfeldt, Christina) Modified on 7/9/2020 to restrict access(cjs).
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to William Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Phyllis Owan. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Equinor Energy, LP. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2020. (am)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT (Declaration of Adam Landstrom) re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equinor Energy, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Damage Settlement and Surface Use Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Commencement of Drilling Operations, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email from Adam Landstrom, #4 Exhibit 4 - Email dated February 7, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email dated March 18, 2019)(am)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equinor Energy, LP from Williams County District Court, case number 53-2020-CV-00726. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000849 filed by Equinor Energy, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owan et al v. Equinor Energy, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinor Energy, LP
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Owan
Represented By: Thomas E. Kalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Owan
Represented By: Thomas E. Kalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?