Heggen Lewis et al v. Nine Point Energy, LLC
Plaintiff: Sarah Heggen Lewis, Marn Heggen and Emily Heggen
Defendant: Nine Point Energy, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00124
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #16 MOTION. Clerk's Office removed duplicative 'exhibit' in docket text and added descriptions to attachments. Pursuant to Administrative Policy Section XIII(A) each attachment must contain a description of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. See Guide to Filing Attachments on our website for further instruction. www.ndd.uscourts.gov. (pb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Nine Point Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Oil & Gas Lease 03/18/2010, #3 Exhibit 2 - Oil & Gas Lease of M. Heggen 03/25/2010, #4 Exhibit 3 - Oil & Gas Lease of E. Heggen 03/25/2010, #5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Michael Ross)(Bacon, Samuel) Modified to remove duplicative 'exhibit' in docket text and to add descriptions to attachments on 9/8/2020 (pb).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Nine Point Energy, LLC. (cjs)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Nine Point Energy, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/21/2020. (js)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER granting #10 MOTION for a 21 Day Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have until 8/31/2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Sage Bacon on behalf of Nine Point Energy, LLC (Bacon, Samuel)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for a 21 Day Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Nine Point Energy, LLC. (Tooley, Brian)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nine Point Energy, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nine Point Energy Holdings, Inc for Nine Point Energy, LLC.. (Tooley, Brian)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jens Jensen on behalf of Nine Point Energy, LLC (Jensen, Jens)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S Tooley on behalf of Nine Point Energy, LLC (Tooley, Brian)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Emily Heggen, Marn Heggen, Sarah Heggen Lewis. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sarah Heggen Lewis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/29/2020. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marn Heggen. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/29/2020. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Emily Heggen. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/29/2020. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nine Point Energy, LLC. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nine Point Energy, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000884) filed by Sarah Heggen Lewis, Marn Heggen, Emily Heggen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heggen Lewis et al v. Nine Point Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Heggen Lewis
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marn Heggen
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Heggen
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Point Energy, LLC
Represented By: Jens Jensen
Represented By: Samuel Sage Bacon
Represented By: Brian S Tooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?