Heggen Lewis et al v. XTO Energy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Heggen Lewis, Marn Heggen and Emily Heggen
Defendant: XTO Holdings, LLC and XTO Energy Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00125
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Emily Heggen, Marn Heggen, Sarah Heggen Lewis. (Barton, George)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC. (Tiblets, Elizabeth)
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for More Definite Statement by XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC. (Tiblets, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER re #15 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have until 9/4/2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC. (King, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, no longer assigned as presiding judge.(js)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC. (js)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth L. Tiblets. (pb)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to XTO Holdings, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/19/2020. (cjs)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to XTO Energy Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/19/2020. (cjs)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey C. King. (cjs)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth L. Tiblets (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2001277) by XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC. (Tiblets, Elizabeth) Modified to add receipt number on 8/5/2020 (pb).
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey C. King (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2001258) by XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC. (King, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/5/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Emily Heggen, Marn Heggen, Sarah Heggen Lewis. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Sarah Heggen Lewis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/29/2020. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marn Heggen. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/29/2020. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Emily Heggen. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/29/2020. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC. (rh)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XTO Energy Inc., XTO Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000885) filed by Sarah Heggen Lewis, Marn Heggen, Emily Heggen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heggen Lewis et al v. XTO Energy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Heggen Lewis
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marn Heggen
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Heggen
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C King
Represented By: Elizabeth Tiblets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTO Energy Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey C King
Represented By: Elizabeth Tiblets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?