Aune v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Karla Aune
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and Lee Huizenga
Case Number: 1:2020cv00126
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, #12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, #7 MOTION to Remand by BNSF Railway Company, Lee Huizenga. (Hart, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Karla Aune. (Sanderson, Paul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer filed by BNSF Railway Company, Lee Huizenga. (Hart, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by BNSF Railway Company, Lee Huizenga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer)(Hart, Robert)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by BNSF Railway Company, Lee Huizenga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Derek Johnson, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Lee Huizenga, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Scott Zainhofsky)(Hart, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Lee Huizenga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Powers Order)(Hart, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dean Hart, I on behalf of Lee Huizenga (Hart, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Karla Aune. (Sanderson, Paul)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Karla Aune. (Sanderson, Paul)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dean Hart, I on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Hart, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karla Aune re #4 Response to Motion Certificate of Service (Sanderson, Paul)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Lee Huizenga's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Karla Aune. (Sanderson, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for BNSF Railway Company.. (cjs)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Lee Huizenga. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Summons, Complaint, Letters Testamentary, #3 Exhibit 2-U.S. DOT Crossing Inventory Form, #4 Exhibit 3-Affidavit of James D. Styron, #5 Exhibit 4-Affidavit of Scott D. Zainhofsky, #6 Exhibit 5-Stanley Crossing FRA Map, #7 Exhibit 6-Rentz Registry of Actions)(cjs)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lee Huizenga, BNSF Railway Company from Mountrail County District Court, case number None Assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 320000364 filed by Lee Huizenga, BNSF Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2-Service of Process, Summons, Complaint, Letters Testamentary, #4 Exhibit 3-Answer, #5 Exhibit 4-Letter dated January 31, 2020)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aune v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Robert Dean Hart, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Huizenga
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Robert Dean Hart, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Aune
Represented By: Damian J. Huettl
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?