Bluestone Construction, Inc. v. Graham Construction Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bluestone Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America and Graham Construction Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00127
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/8/2020. (cjs)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Graham Construction Services, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/8/2020. (cjs)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 8 MOTION to Transfer to Hennepin County District Court. Responses due by 9/18/2020. (BG)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve and File Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss by Bluestone Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Serve and File Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer and Motion to Diss)(Lautt, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/26/2020. (rh)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Graham Construction Services, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/26/2020. (rh)
August 12, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Multiple motion relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion to Transfer at 8 . Re: #6 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's office added link to 8 Motion to Transfer and clarified docket text. Re: #7 Affidavit. Clerk's office added link to 8 Motion to Transfer and clarified docket text. (rh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer to Hennepin County District Court by Graham Construction Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (See document #5 ) (rh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Matthew T. Collins in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 8 MOTION to Transfer to Hennepin County District Court by Graham Construction Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Graham Business Filing Details)(Collins, Matthew) Modified on 8/12/2020 to add link and clarify docket text. (rh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 8 MOTION to Transfer to Hennepin County District Court filed by Graham Construction Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Collins, Matthew) Modified on 8/12/2020 to add link and clarify docket text. (rh)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Transfer by Graham Construction Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Collins, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Bluestone Construction, Inc. (rh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bluestone Construction, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/31/2020. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Graham Construction Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Graham Construction Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000895) filed by Bluestone Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Payment Bond, #3 Exhibit 2 - Subcontract, #4 Exhibit 3 - Invoice #1682, #5 Exhibit 4 - Final Pay Application)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluestone Construction, Inc. v. Graham Construction Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Matthew T. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluestone Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Lautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?