Ceynar et al v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Plaintiff: David Ceynar, Virginia Ceynar, Birdhead Company, LLC, The and Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00139
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Oasis Petroleum and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings as of September 30, 2020 by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stahl, Craig)
September 22, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's Office modified docket text to note Oasis Petroleum Inc. as a Other Affiliate. (js)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Oasis Petroleum LLC, identifying Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum Inc. for Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Stahl, Craig) Modified on 9/22/2020 to note Oasis Petroleum Inc. as an Affiliate and not a corporate parent. (js)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC.(Stahl, Craig)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until 9/21/2020 to file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. (BG) Modified on 8/26/2020 to correct answer due date. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (Stahl, Craig)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Jonathan Forster on behalf of Oasis Petroleum North America LLC (Forster, Paul)
August 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Kuehnle on behalf of Oasis Petroleum North America LLC (Kuehnle, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig L. Stahl on behalf of Oasis Petroleum North America LLC (Stahl, Craig)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (cjs)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Birdhead Company, LLC, The, David Ceynar, Virginia Ceynar, Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. (cjs)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/17/2020. (rh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Virginia Ceynar. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/17/2020. (rh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to David Ceynar. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/17/2020. (rh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Birdhead Company, LLC, The. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/17/2020. (rh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Oasis Petroleum North America LLC. (rh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oasis Petroleum North America LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000936) filed by Virginia Ceynar, Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC, Birdhead Company, LLC, The, David Ceynar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceynar et al v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Kuehnle
Represented By: Craig L. Stahl
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ceynar
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Ceynar
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birdhead Company, LLC, The
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?