Schuh v. Burleigh Morton Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Schuh
Defendant: Eric LNU, FNU Howe and Burleigh Morton Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv00142
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Ricky Schuh (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (cjs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Ricky Schuh (Attachments: #1 Grievance Report Form, #2 Mailing Envelope) (cjs)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ricky R. Schuh. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Burleigh Morton Detention Center, FNU Howe, Eric LNU filed by Ricky R. Schuh. (Attachments: #1 Response to grievances, response to Sgt. Howe, information for Jewish conversion, grievance report forms, requests for religious diet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to Burleigh Morton Detention Center and Ricky Schuh re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (rh)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed to BMDC and Ricky Schuh on 8/18/2020. (rh)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ricky R. Schuh. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/31/2020. (cjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Response to grievances, response to Sgt. Howe, information for Jewish conversion, grievance report forms, requests for religious diet, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit, #3 Mailing Envelope, #4 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky R. Schuh. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuh v. Burleigh Morton Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burleigh Morton Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?