Lewis v. United States of America
Plaintiff: James S. Lewis
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00152
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America served on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Brooks, Constance)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America served on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Brooks, Constance)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by James S. Lewis. (cjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to James S. Lewis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/31/2020. (cjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000976) filed by James S. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S. Lewis
Represented By: Aaron J. Weber
Represented By: Danielle Bettencourt
Represented By: Dennis E. Johnson
Represented By: Constance E. Brooks
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?