Ricker v. Cretex Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Zachary R. Ricker
Defendant: Cretex Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00153
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Lynn P. Schuler re #8 Reply to Response to Motion by Cretex Companies, Inc.. (McLean, Ian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cretex Companies, Inc.. (McLean, Ian)
September 15, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Response to Motion. Clerks office added descriptions to Exhibits. (js)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Ricker's Response to Cretex Companies, Inc. filed by Zachary R. Ricker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey S. Weikum, #2 Exhibit A - ND Secretary of State Web Search for Elk River Concrete Products, #3 Exhibit B - ND Secretary of State Web Search for Cretex Concrete Products North, Inc., #4 Exhibit C - ND Secretary of State Web Search for Cretex Concrete Products West, Inc., #5 Exhibit D - ND Secretary of State Web Search for Cretex Properties, Inc., #6 Exhibit E - ND State Secretary of State Website Search for Forterra Concrete Products, Inc., #7 Exhibit F - ND Secretary of State Web Search for The Cretex Companies, Inc., #8 Exhibit G - Screenshot of ermc.com/about/history Website, #9 Exhibit H - Screenshot of emrc.com/contract-manufacturing/certifications Website, #10 Exhibit I - Screenshot of ermc.com/about/history Website showing Hydra-Steer Trailers, #11 Exhibit J - Screenshot of ermc.com/about/history Website showing Axel Hydra-Steer Trailers, #12 Exhibit K - Screenshot of ermc.com/ Website page of a concrete bridge, #13 Exhibit L - Screenshot of concreteproducts.com/news/5076-cretex-adds-iowas-quality-concrete-csi-precast.html#-UIMFKiUI/ website page dated 01.10.2011, #14 Exhibit M - Screenshot of aecinfo.com/1/company/09/16/61/company_1.html Website page dated 01.10.2011, #15 Exhibit N - A copy of Burleigh County Commission Meeting Minutes from March 21, 2016).(Weikum, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/15/2020 to include Exhibit Descriptions.(js).
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Lynn P. Schuler re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cretex Companies, Inc.. (McLean, Ian)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cretex Companies, Inc.. (McLean, Ian)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cretex Companies, Inc.. (McLean, Ian)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chelsea R. McLean. (pb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chelsea R. McLean (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2009118) by Cretex Companies, Inc.. (McLean, Chelsea) Modified to add receipt number on 8/19/2020 (pb).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cretex Companies, Inc. from Burleigh County District Court (no case number assigned). Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 320000402 filed by Cretex Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Ronald McLean, #3 Exhibit 1-Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury, #4 Exhibit 2-Letter dated July 21, 2020)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricker v. Cretex Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cretex Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Represented By: Chelsea McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary R. Ricker
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?