Nelson v. Minnesota Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Travis Darwin Nelson
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2020cv00155
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Mr. Nelson at Mercer County Jail re #10 Order to Show Cause,, Terminate Motions,. Mail not resent to Travis Darwin Nelson as Order at #10 was also distributed to Mr. Nelson in c/o North Dakota State Penitentiary. (cjs)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Travis Darwin Nelson (Previously changed at Document #9 ) (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel without prejudice and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2020. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) Distributed on 9/1/2020 to Mr. Nelson at the Mercer County Jail and NDSP (cjs).
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Travis Darwin Nelson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Minnesota Department of Corrections filed by Travis Darwin Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to Travis Darwin Nelson and Mercer County Jail re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (cjs)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG) Distributed on 8/28/2020 (cjs).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Travis Darwin Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Travis Darwin Nelson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/1/2020. (rh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Travis Darwin Nelson. (rh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #3 Mailing Envelope)(rh)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Travis Darwin Nelson. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Minnesota Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Darwin Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?