Lawrimore v. Equinor Energy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Devin Lawrimore
Defendant: Equinor Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00157
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (4 days) (BG)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 8/27/2021. Discovery Motions due by 8/13/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/6/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/3/2021. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 10/1/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 10/22/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 1/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/15/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 8/20/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021. (BG)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2020. (BG)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Equinor Energy Services, Inc.. (Sand, Benjamin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equinor Energy Services, Inc. from Ward County District Court, no case number assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120000981 filed by Equinor Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Service by Mail, #5 Exhibit D-Declaration of Carter Williams, #6 Exhibit E-Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint, #7 Exhibit F-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit G-Certificate of Service)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrimore v. Equinor Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Lawrimore
Represented By: James Edward Nostdahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinor Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?