Hunzeker et al v. Bureau of Land Management (BLM)
Plaintiff: Lee Robert Turner, Jeanne Elaine Turner and Lisa Turner Hunzeker
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management (BLM)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00158
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bureau of Land Management (BLM) re #10 Consent/Reassignment Form (Schoepf, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Bureau of Land Management (BLM). (rh)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bureau of Land Management (BLM). Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/15/2020. (cjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Lisa Turner Hunzeker. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jeanne Elaine Turner. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Lee Robert Turner. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lee Robert Turner. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/3/2020. (cjs)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jeanne Elaine Turner. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/3/2020. (cjs)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lisa Turner Hunzeker. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/3/2020. (cjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bureau of Land Management (BLM). Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/2/2020. (cjs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bureau of Land Management (BLM) from McKenzie County District Court, case number 27-2020-cv-00253. Filing fee waived filed by Bureau of Land Management (BLM). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Register of Actions, #3 Notice of Judge Assignment, #4 Complaint, #5 Quit Claim Deed, #6 McKenzie County Recordings, #7 Applicable Laws)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunzeker et al v. Bureau of Land Management (BLM)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Robert Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Elaine Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Turner Hunzeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management (BLM)
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?