Langford et al v. Juarez Cartel et al
Plaintiff: K. L., D. L., J. L., Brandy Karen Spenst, Dawna Ray Langford, B. L., R. L., M. L., T. L., Crystal Alexis Langford, Cole Langford, C. L., David Langford, Bryce David Langford and X. L.
Defendant: Juarez Cartel, John Does I through LX and La Linea
Case Number: 1:2020cv00159
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 All future pleadings shall be filed in Lead Case No. 1:20-cv-132. (cjs)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel L. Hovland no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
September 14, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk's Office replaced with non-fillable PDF. (js)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacey Skinner. (js)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jacey Skinner (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2025097) by B. L., C. L., D. L., J. L., K. L., M. L., R. L., T. L., X. L., Bryce David Langford, Cole Langford, Crystal Alexis Langford, David Langford, Dawna Ray Langford, Brandy Karen Spenst. (Skinner, Jacey) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/14/2020 with non-fillable PDF; and to add receipt number to docket text). (js).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 #4 #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Mark S. Kokanovich, Jillian L. Andrews, and Henry E. Hockeimer, Jr. (ajs)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Henry E. Hockeimer, Jr. (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2016131) by B. L., C. L., D. L., J. L., K. L., M. L., R. L., T. L., X. L., Bryce David Langford, Cole Langford, Crystal Alexis Langford, David Langford, Dawna Ray Langford, Brandy Karen Spenst. (Hockeimer, Henry) Modified to add receipt number on 8/28/2020 (ajs).
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jillian L. Andrews (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2016084) by B. L., C. L., D. L., J. L., K. L., M. L., R. L., T. L., X. L., Bryce David Langford, Cole Langford, Crystal Alexis Langford, David Langford, Dawna Ray Langford, Brandy Karen Spenst. (Andrews, Jillian) Modified to add receipt number on 8/28/2020 (ajs).
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2015915) by B. L., C. L., D. L., J. L., K. L., M. L., R. L., T. L., X. L., Bryce David Langford, Cole Langford, Crystal Alexis Langford, David Langford, Dawna Ray Langford, Brandy Karen Spenst. (Kokanovich, Mark) Modified to add receipt number on 8/28/2020 (ajs).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John Does I through LX, Juarez Cartel, La Linea. (cjs)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does I through LX, Juarez Cartel, La Linea (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000995) filed by X. L., J. L., R. L., D. L., David Langford, Brandy Karen Spenst, C. L., Crystal Alexis Langford, Bryce David Langford, Cole Langford, Dawna Ray Langford, K. L., B. L., M. L., T. L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford et al v. Juarez Cartel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Karen Spenst
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawna Ray Langford
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Alexis Langford
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Langford
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Langford
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce David Langford
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X. L.
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Mark Kokanovich
Represented By: Henry E Hockeimer, Jr
Represented By: Jacey Skinner
Represented By: Jillian Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juarez Cartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I through LX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Linea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?