Thompson v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Thompson
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Does 1 through 100, C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00160
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
September 16, 2020 Filing 36 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (cjs)
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to McKesson Corporation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/23/2020. (rh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/23/2020. (rh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to C.R. Bard, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/23/2020. (rh)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #29 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Zachary E. Pelham for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., and McKesson Corporation. (BG)
August 27, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation re #28 Notice of Appearance, #30 Stipulation of Dismissal, #29 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Pelham, Zachary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal by McKesson Corporation. (Pelham, Zachary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Pelham, Zachary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary E. Pelham on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., McKesson Corporation (Pelham, Zachary)
August 26, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from Northern District of Texas; Case Number 3:20-cv-02473. Original file, transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #22 Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Ronald Dominy's case be severed and transferred to the Charlotte Division of the Western District of North Carolina (Civil case 3:20-cv-2467 opened); b. Plaintiff Norman Gueno's case be severed and transferred to the Hattiesburg Division of the Southern District of Mississippi (Civil case 3:20-cv-2468 opened); c. Plaintiff Darell Harvey's case be severed and transferred to the Los Angeles Division of the Central District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2469 opened); d. Plaintiff Kathleen Higgs's case be severed and transferred to the Springfield Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2470 opened); e. Plaintiff Bernard Hughes's case be severed and transferred to the Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2471 opened); f. Plaintiff Stanley Smith's case be severed and transferred to the Akron Division of the Northern District of Ohio (Civil case 3:20-cv-2472 opened); g. Plaintiff Terrance Thompson's case be severed and transferred to the Bismarck Division of the District of North Dakota (Civil case 3:20-cv-2473 opened); and h. Plaintiff Malilae Washington's case be severed and transferred to the District of Columbia (Civil case 3:20-2474 opened). Plaintiff Ricardo Mata is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/20/2020) (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order:Pursuant to the parties' agreement, see ECF Nos. 22, 24, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Tina Votava's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED, (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (ykp)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 13, 2020 Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington re #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This civil action is transferred to the docket of Judge Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-CV-1531-S. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/7/2020) (aaa)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs have until 8/3/2020 to respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. It is further ORDERED that Defendants have until 9/3/2020 to file replies. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/29/2020) (ykp)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Dominy, Norman Gueno, Darell Harvey, Kathleen Higgs, Bernard Hughes, Ricardo Mata, Stanley Smith, Terrance Thompson, Tina Votava, Malilae Washington (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 11 replaced to flatten image on 6/18/2020) (dsr).
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10907739) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corp., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #15 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary E. Pelham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?