Schleve v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Tanner C. Schleve
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00166
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BNSF Railway Company.(Cook, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (rh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120001025) filed by Tanner C. Schleve. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) Modified on 9/8/2020 (rh) to add receipt number.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schleve v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Represented By: Andrew D. Cook
Represented By: Daniel A. Haws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanner C. Schleve
Represented By: Jonathan L Stone
Represented By: Nicholas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?