Beyl v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Dale Beyl
Defendant: Richard Anderson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00175
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. (3 days) (JS)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2022 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Discovery Motions due by 5/3/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/30/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/2/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 8/16/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 8/16/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 9/13/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 1/11/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 5/13/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 5/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2021. (JS)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2020. (JS)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Richard Anderson. (Hughes, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of Richard Anderson (Hughes, John)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Richard Anderson from Mountrail County District Court, case number unknown. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 120001078. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- Mountrail County Summons and Complaint)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beyl v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Beyl
Represented By: Eric Hinckley
Represented By: Zachary Peter Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Anderson
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?