Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation v. ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation
Defendant: ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00193
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (5 days). (JS) Modified on 12/17/2020 to add length of trial. Regenerated NEF (cjs).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Main Document 22 replaced on 12/18/2020 to remove blank page). Regenerated NEF. (jb)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2022 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Discovery Motions due by 12/3/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/1/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/15/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/15/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/15/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 12/15/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 2/5/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 6/4/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 8/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2021. (JS)
December 17, 2020 Filing 19 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 12/17/2020. (JS)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 *RESTRICTED-WRONG HEARING SELECTED FOR MINUTE ENTRY* See Minute entry at docket entry 19 . (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Status Conference held on 12/17/2020. (JS) Regenerated on 12/17/2020 (cjs).
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. (jb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/2/2020. (pb)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. re #13 Answer to Complaint (Harrie, William)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc..(Harrie, William)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #10 #11 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Michael D. Anderson and Clark Rucker. (ajs)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2059779) by Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation. (Rucker, Clark) Modified on 11/3/2020 to add receipt number.(sj).
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2059750) by Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation. (Anderson, Michael) Modified on 11/3/2020 to add receipt number. (sj).
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation. (mf)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation. (Huckfeldt, Christina)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation. ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020 (Bender, Lawrence)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/9/2020. (rh)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. re #4 Notice of Appearance (Harrie, William)
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Harrie on behalf of ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. (Harrie, William)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/3/2020. (jb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. (jb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 121000053) filed by Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation v. ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobra Oil & Gas Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Christina Ann Huckfeldt
Represented By: Clark Rucker
Represented By: Michael D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShockCo Oil Tools, Inc.
Represented By: William P. Harrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?