White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC v. Krank
Plaintiff: White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC
Defendant: Bruce Krank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00209
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor re #47 Notice filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. The Defendant shall file a Response by 1/13/2021. (CK)
January 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 1/13/2021 (mf)
January 7, 2021 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of Chad Centrobi re #47 Notice (Other), #39 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Annual Performance Bond)(Grant, Nicholas)
January 7, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC re #39 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Proof of Security (Grant, Nicholas)
January 6, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to Counterclaim 45 by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC.(Grant, Nicholas)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
January 5, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 7/11/2022 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (3 days) (BG)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Discovery Motions due by 10/1/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/1/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 12/1/2021. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 1/10/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 2/22/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 3/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 3/1/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 6/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2022. (BG)
January 5, 2021 Filing 40 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 1/5/2021. (BG)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor GRANTING #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC, and DENYING #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bruce Krank. (CK)
December 28, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #38 Amended Answer. Clerk's office corrected link, clarified docket text and regenerated the NEF. (rh)
December 23, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #37 Amended Document. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Amended Answer at #38 . (jb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 45 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC filed by Bruce Krank. See Document #38 . (mf)
December 22, 2020 Filing 38 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC by Bruce Krank. (jb) Modified on 12/28/2020 to correct link and clarify docket text. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
December 22, 2020 Filing 37 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bruce Krank. Amendment to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . (Johnson, Ariston) Modified on 12/23/2020 to restrict access. (jb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 36 BRIEF re #30 Order by Bruce Krank. (mf)
December 22, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #35 Response to Motion. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as Brief #36 . (mf)
December 21, 2020 Filing 35 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing Post-Hearing Supplemental Memorandum filed by Bruce Krank. (Johnson, Ariston) Modified on 12/22/2020 to restrict access (mf).
December 18, 2020 Filing 34 SEALED DOCUMENT (Affidavit of Steven Reker) re #31 Sealed Document by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Hiline Water Supply Project)(cjs)
December 18, 2020 Filing 33 SEALED DOCUMENT Third Affidavit of Chad Centorbi (and Exhibits) re #31 Sealed Document by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_NDIC 12-6-96 Permit for Fluid Injection, #2 Exhibit 2_NDIC 06-12-97 Letter to Bhargava Name Change, #3 Exhibit 3_NDIC 06-10-99 Letter to Russell Approving Change of Operator, #4 Exhibit 4_NDIC 01-18-20 Letter to Hazlett Change of Operator, #5 Exhibit 5_NDIC 12-11-03 Principal Name Change of Whiting, #6 Exhibit 6_NDIC 10-15-15 Letter to White Rock_Form 15, NtcToTransfer O&G Wells, #7 Exhibit 7_Net Operating Statement (12 2019 through 11 2020))(Grant, Nicholas) (Attachment 7 replaced on 12/21/2020 to remove overlapping headers) (cjs). Regenerated on 12/21/2020 (cjs).
December 18, 2020 Filing 32 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* AFFIDAVIT of Steven Reker re #31 Sealed Document by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Hiline Water Supply Project)(Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 12/18/2020 to restrict access(cjs).
December 18, 2020 Filing 31 SEALED DOCUMENT Plaintiff White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC's Post Hearing Brief re #30 Order, by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
December 18, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #32 Affidavit. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Sealed Document at #34 . (cjs)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor Setting Post-Hearing Deadlines. Plaintiff's post-hearing evidence, affidavits, and briefing due by 12:00 p.m. (noon) CST on 12/18/2020. Defendant's responsive evidence, affidavits, and briefing due by 5:00 p.m. CST on 12/23/2020. (CK)
December 14, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel M. Traynor: Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2020 re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bruce Krank and #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Court Reporter RC) (jr)
December 11, 2020 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas C. Grant re #25 Reply to Response to Motion by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_KLD Subdivision_KLD Plat, #2 Exhibit 2_Doc No 3064049, #3 Exhibit 3_Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit 4_Doc No 3064050, #5 Exhibit 5_KrankTax Statement, #6 Exhibit 6_NDIC Well Search)(Grant, Nicholas)
December 11, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #25 Reply to Response. Clerk's office linked to correct document. (jb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. See document #25 . (jb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT Second of Chad Centorbi re #25 Reply to Response to Motion by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Map of HL Unit w Existing & Prop Underground)(Grant, Nicholas)
December 10, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 12/11/2020 to correct link. (jb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Counterclaim #16 by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC.(Grant, Nicholas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. identifying White Rock Holdings, LLC as Other Affiliate (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 12/7/2020 to add corporate information. Regenerated NEF. (rh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bruce Krank. (See Document #19 ) (rh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Ariston E. Johnson re #19 Response to Motion by Bruce Krank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - List of Wells)(Johnson, Ariston)
December 2, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Bruce Krank re #19 Response to Motion by Bruce Krank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Map of Vicinity, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from White Rock)(Johnson, Ariston)
December 2, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by Bruce Krank. (Johnson, Ariston) Modified on 12/3/2020 to remove incorrect link. (rh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bruce Krank. (Johnson, Ariston)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC by Bruce Krank.(Johnson, Ariston)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting 11 Motion for Hearing and Setting Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 12/14/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Defendant's Response Brief due 12/3/2020. Plaintiff's Reply Brief due 12/10/2020. (CK)
November 20, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED at #14 . Corrected the party served to: Bruce Krank. (sj)
November 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing. Responses due by 12/3/2020 Replies due by 12/10/2020. (cjs)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. Bruce Krank served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (sj)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #7 Order on Motion for TRO, #12 MEMORANDUM in Support, #6 Affidavit, #9 MEMORANDUM in Support, #2 Summons Issued, #5 Affidavit, 11 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing, #4 MEMORANDUM in Support, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #10 Affidavit filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 11/20/2020 to restrict access. (sj).
November 16, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerks Office filed Motion for Hearing at 11 . (lf)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing AMENDED filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (See Document #8 ) (rh)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Chad Centorbi re #9 MEMORANDUM in Support by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Expedited Hearing by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor DENYING #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (CK)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Nicholas C. Grant re #4 MEMORANDUM in Support by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Chad Centorbi re #4 MEMORANDUM in Support by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bruce Krank. (rh)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruce Krank (Filing fee $400, receipt number 121000127) filed by White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gress Lease, #2 Exhibit B - Order 7678, #3 Exhibit C - Plan of Unitization, #4 Exhibit D - Unit Operating Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Order 7679, #6 Exhibit F - Order 7680, #7 Exhibit G - Gress Ratification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC v. Krank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Rock Oil & Gas, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Krank
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?