Voegele v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kerry Kim Voegele
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00217
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall have until 3/26/2021 to file a response to the Complaint and the Certified Administrative Record. (BG)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint (unopposed), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified Administrative Record by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis)(Wall, Sarah)
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration, United States Attorney General, and United States Attorney for the District of North Dakota served on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021. (jb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Commissioner of Social Security. (cjs)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Wall, Sarah)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (Wicklund, Edward)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Kerry Kim Voegele. (cjs)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kerry Kim Voegele. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (BG)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kerry Kim Voegele. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/8/2020. (cjs)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. (cjs)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edward A. Wicklund (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2072899) by Kerry Kim Voegele. (Wicklund, Edward) Modified on 11/24/2020 to add receipt number (cjs).
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kerry Kim Voegele. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voegele v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Kim Voegele
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?