Drake v. Stenehjem et al
Plaintiff: Robert Drake
Defendant: Wayne Stenehjem, Dick Gulmon, Jeffrey Erickson, Michael Bishop, Duane Magnuson, Valley City, City of, Dave Carlsrud and Jeffery Erickson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00231
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand City Defendants' Answer and Demand for Jury Trial by Michael Bishop, Dave Carlsrud, Jeffery Erickson, Dick Gulmon, Duane Magnuson, Valley City, City of.(Gaustad, Daniel)
January 5, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment andMOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Robert Drake. (Boughey, Lynn)
December 29, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment andMOTION for Attorney Fees City of Valley City's Response to Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Attorney Fees filed by Michael Bishop, Dave Carlsrud, Jeffery Erickson, Dick Gulmon, Duane Magnuson, Valley City, City of. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph E. Quinn in Support of City of Valley City's Response to Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Attorney Fees)(Gaustad, Daniel)
December 24, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wayne Stenehjem. (Nicolai, James)
December 22, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment andMOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Robert Drake. (Boughey, Lynn)
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Robert Drake. (Boughey, Lynn)
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valley City, City of. Valley City, City of waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Duane Magnuson. Duane Magnuson waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dick Gulmon. Dick Gulmon waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffery Erickson. Jeffery Erickson waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dave Carlsrud. Dave Carlsrud waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Bishop. Michael Bishop waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Gaustad on behalf of Michael Bishop, Dave Carlsrud, Jeffery Erickson, Dick Gulmon, Duane Magnuson, Valley City, City of (Gaustad, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Wayne Stenehjem. (Nicolai, James)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Robert Drake. (Boughey, Lynn)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment and, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Robert Drake. (Boughey, Lynn)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Drake. Wayne Stenehjem waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Boughey, Lynn)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wayne Stenehjem. (Nicolai, James)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wayne Stenehjem. (Nicolai, James)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Nicolai on behalf of Wayne Stenehjem (Nicolai, James)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael Bishop, Dave Carlsrud, Jeffery Erickson, Dick Gulmon, Duane Magnuson, Wayne Stenehjem, Valley City, City of. (mf) Modified on 12/14/2020 to correct defendant's name. (rh)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Bishop, Dave Carlsrud, Jeffery Erickson, Dick Gulmon, Duane Magnuson, Wayne Stenehjem, Valley City, City of (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000207) filed by Robert Drake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Listing of Defendants)(mf) Modified on 12/14/2020 to correct defendant's name. (rh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. Stenehjem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Stenehjem
Represented By: James E. Nicolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Gulmon
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bishop
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Magnuson
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley City, City of
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Carlsrud
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Erickson
Represented By: Ella Braaten
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Drake
Represented By: Lynn M. Boughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?