Martinez v. Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd
Plaintiff: Crystal Martinez
Defendant: Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd and Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00035
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 14, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC.(Fylling, Quinn)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (jb) Modified on 4/14/2021 to correct docket text. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC. (jb)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/15/2021. (js)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant has until 4/14/2021 to file an Answer or otherwise respond. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 1, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 STIPULATION. Modified entry to reflect remove terminated filer (Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd.). (js)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC, Arnett. (Fylling, Quinn) Modified on 4/1/2021 to remove terminated filer. (js)
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Quinn P. Fylling on behalf of Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC (Fylling, Quinn)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Crystal Martinez. (mf) Modified on 4/1/2021 to correct filer (cjs).
March 15, 2021 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Crystal Martinez. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/22/2021. (jb)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Martinez. Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021 (Fiebiger, Thomas)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 Amended Summons Issued as to Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC. (cjs)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC filed by Crystal Martinez.(cjs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Martinez. Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021 (Fiebiger, Thomas)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd. (cjs)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Crystal Martinez. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/10/2021. (cjs)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000400) filed by Crystal Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnett & Burgess Pipeliners (Rockies) LLC
Represented By: Quinn P. Fylling
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Martinez
Represented By: Thomas Dayton Fiebiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?