Shanco, LLC v. Markel American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shanco, LLC
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00038
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 9/27/2022 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (4 days) (JS)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 12/31/2021. Discovery Motions due by 1/14/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/1/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 3/31/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 8/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 12/15/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 1/14/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/4/2022. (JS)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 4/1/2021. (JS)
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Markel American Insurance Company. (jb)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Shanco, LLC. (cjs)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Markel American Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company (Hughes, John)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Markel American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel American Insurance Company.. (Hanson, Laura)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Jean Hanson on behalf of Markel American Insurance Company (Hanson, Laura)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Shanco, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/11/2021. (cjs)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Markel American Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/11/2021. (cjs)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Markel American Insurance Company from Ward County District Court, case number None. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000402 filed by Markel American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shanco, LLC v. Markel American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Laura Jean Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanco, LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?