De La Torre v. Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Alva De La Torre
Defendant: MBI Oil and Gas, LLC, MBI Energy Logistics, LLC, Missouri Basin Well Service, Inc. doing business as MBI Energy Services, Whiting Petroleum Corporation, Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation, MBI Fishing and Rental, MBI Energy Rentals, Inc. and Yankee Fishing & Rentals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00072
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by MBI Energy Logistics, LLC, MBI Energy Rentals, Inc., MBI Fishing and Rental, Missouri Basin Well Service, Inc., Yankee Fishing & Rentals, Inc..(Vendsel, Jason)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Vendsel on behalf of MBI Energy Logistics, LLC, MBI Energy Rentals, Inc., MBI Fishing and Rental, Missouri Basin Well Service, Inc., Yankee Fishing & Rentals, Inc. (Vendsel, Jason)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alva De La Torre. MBI Oil and Gas, LLC waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (O'Brien, Tatum)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alva De La Torre. MBI Energy Rentals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (O'Brien, Tatum)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alva De La Torre. Yankee Fishing & Rentals, Inc. waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (O'Brien, Tatum)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alva De La Torre. Missouri Basin Well Service, Inc. waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (O'Brien, Tatum)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alva De La Torre. MBI Fishing and Rental waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (O'Brien, Tatum)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alva De La Torre. MBI Energy Logistics, LLC waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (O'Brien, Tatum)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alva De La Torre. Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Whiting Petroleum Corporation waiver sent on 4/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (O'Brien, Tatum)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MBI Energy Logistics, LLC, MBI Energy Rentals, Inc., MBI Fishing and Rental, MBI Oil and Gas, LLC, Missouri Basin Well Service, Inc. d/b/a MBI Energy Services, Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation, Whiting Petroleum Corporation, Yankee Fishing & Rentals, Inc.. (mf)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MBI Energy Logistics, LLC, MBI Energy Rentals, Inc., MBI Fishing and Rental, MBI Oil and Gas, LLC, Missouri Basin Well Service, Inc. d/b/a MBI Energy Services, Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation, Whiting Petroleum Corporation, Yankee Fishing & Rentals, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000219) filed by Alva De La Torre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Torre v. Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBI Oil and Gas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBI Energy Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Basin Well Service, Inc. doing business as MBI Energy Services
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiting Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBI Fishing and Rental
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBI Energy Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yankee Fishing & Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alva De La Torre
Represented By: Tatum O'Brien
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Keeffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?