Equinor Energy L.P. et al v. Sunny Acres, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Equinor Energy L.P., Brigham Oil & Gas L.P. and Statoil Oil and Gas L.P.
Defendant: Sunny Acres, LLC and Larry Novak
Case Number: 1:2021cv00082
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Larry Novak. (Braaten, Derrick)
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Larry Novak. (Braaten, Derrick)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Sunny Acres, LLC.(Braaten, Derrick)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until 6/04/2021 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. (BG)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Larry Novak, Sunny Acres, LLC. (Braaten, Derrick)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Derrick L. Braaten on behalf of All Defendants (Braaten, Derrick)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Statoil Oil and Gas L.P., Equinor Energy L.P.. Larry Novak served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021 (Gust, Michael)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Statoil Oil and Gas L.P., Equinor Energy L.P.. Sunny Acres, LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021 (Gust, Michael)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Larry Novak, Sunny Acres, LLC. (jb)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry Novak, Sunny Acres, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000533) filed by Statoil Oil and Gas L.P., Equinor Energy L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Participation Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of Records, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equinor Energy L.P. et al v. Sunny Acres, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equinor Energy L.P.
Represented By: Michael L. Gust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigham Oil & Gas L.P.
Represented By: Michael L. Gust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Statoil Oil and Gas L.P.
Represented By: Michael L. Gust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny Acres, LLC
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Novak
Represented By: Derrick L. Braaten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?