Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC
Defendant: United States Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States of America and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2021cv00090
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (Three hours) (SR)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Adopting Stipulation by Judge Daniel M. Traynor. Tesoro's request for a Temporary Restraining Order 6 is MOOT. Federal Defendants' response to Tesoro's request for a preliminary injunction shall be due on or before July 23, 2021. Tesoro's reply in support of its request for a preliminary injunction shall be due on or before August 13, 2021. (SR)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schoepf on behalf of United States Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States Department of the Interior, United States of America (Schoepf, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 7/23/2021 Replies due by 8/13/2021. (mf)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webb, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC. See document #3 . (cjs)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction to document: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Webb, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC. (Webb, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States Department of the Interior, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cjs)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Indian Affairs, United States Department of the Interior, United States of America (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000567) filed by Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notification of Trespass Determination, #2 Exhibit B-Notice, Order on Administrative Record, and Decision, #3 Exhibit C-Letter dated 12/22/2020, #4 Exhibit D-Receipt of Payment, #5 Exhibit E-Decision Vacating Prior Decisions, #6 Exhibit F-New York Times Article, #7 Exhibit G-Notice of Appeal, #8 Exhibit H-Letter dated 8/6/2020, #9 Exhibit I-Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit J-Freedom of Information Act Request, #11 Exhibit K-Freedom of Information Act Request, #12 Exhibit L-Freedom of Information Act Request, #13 Exhibit M-Freedom of Information Act Request, #14 Exhibit N-Letter dated 10/28/2020, #15 Exhibit O-Freedom of Information Act Request, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs) (Attachment 9 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove double header. NEF regenerated.) (lf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tesoro High Plains Pipeline Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Webb
Represented By: Robert D Comer
Represented By: Matthew A. Dekovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Michael D. Schoepf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?