Sala v. Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Patrick Sala
Defendant: Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00110
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Barron on behalf of Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC (Barron, David)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC.(Jacobson, Mark)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Sala. Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021 (Arbuckle, Melinda)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC. (cjs)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000637) filed by Patrick Sala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sala v. Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Sala
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: Ricardo J. Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Oilfield Services, LLC
Represented By: David Barron
Represented By: Mark A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?