Sala v. Personnel Services LLC
Plaintiff: Patrick Sala
Defendant: Personnel Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00111
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Patrick Sala. (cjs)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Sala. Personnel Services LLC served on 6/3/2021, answer due 6/24/2021 (Arbuckle, Melinda) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/15/2021 to remove overlapping filing headers and unnecessary page) (cjs). Regenerated on 6/15/2021 (cjs).
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Patrick Sala. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/14/2021. (jb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2021: #1 Second Notice of Direct Assignment). Regenerated NEF. (jb)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Personnel Services LLC. (cjs)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Patrick Sala. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/28/2021. (cjs)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Personnel Services LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000637) filed by Patrick Sala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sala v. Personnel Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personnel Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Sala
Represented By: Melinda Arbuckle
Represented By: Ricardo J. Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?