Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC v. RES America Construction Inc.
Plaintiff: Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC
Defendant: RES America Construction Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00113
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (7 days) (BG)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Discovery Motions due by 6/30/2022. Expert disclosures for parties seeking affirmative relief due by 6/30/2022. Expert dislosures for experts responding to parties' affirmative claims due by 7/29/2022. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 8/19/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 9/30/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 10/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 12/10/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/10/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2022. Motions to compel arbitration due by 8/31/2021. (BG)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 7/15/2021. (BG)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Scheduling/Discovery Plan by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC. (Brown, Bradford)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT Answer and Counterclaim to document: #1 Notice of Removal, by RES America Construction Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Answer to Counterclaim)(mf)
June 16, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Supplement. Documents should have been filed separately. Clerk's Office restricted access and re-filed at #5 . (mf)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED - SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENTS* SUPPLEMENT Answer & Counterclaim and Plaintiff's Answer to Counterclaim to document: #1 Notice of Removal, by RES America Construction Inc.. (Surma, Nicholas) Modified on 6/16/2021 to restrict access (mf).
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC. (Brown, Bradford)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RES America Construction Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Renewable Energy Systems Holdings Ltd., Corporate Parent Renewable Energy Systems Ltd., Corporate Parent Renewable Energy Systems Americas inc. for RES America Construction Inc... (Surma, Nicholas)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RES America Construction Inc. from Williams County District Court, case number 53-2021-cv-036. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000646 filed by RES America Construction Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Response)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC v. RES America Construction Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RES America Construction Inc.
Represented By: Seth A. Thompson
Represented By: Nicholas M Surma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC
Represented By: Bradford James Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?