Life Insurance Company of North America v. Rod et al
Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Paul D. Ellington, Daniel Tyler and Erik Rod
Case Number: 1:2021cv00125
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Erik Rod by Paul D. Ellington, Daniel Tyler.(Larson, Mark)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs)
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Life Insurance Company of North America. (cjs)
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Erik Rod served on 6/16/2021, answer due 7/7/2021 (McLean, Ian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Daniel Tyler. (jb)
June 16, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Paul D. Ellington. (jb)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James M. Brodzik. (sj)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James M. Brodzik (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2199214) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Brodzik, James) Modified on 6/16/2021 to add receipt number. (sj). (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/16/2021 to correct the document). NEF Regenerated. (sj).
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel K. Ryan (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2199105) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ryan, Daniel) Modified on 6/16/2021 to add receipt number.(sj).
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Paul D. Ellington. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/29/2021. (cjs)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Daniel Tyler. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/29/2021. (cjs)
June 15, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Paul D. Ellington answer due 8/9/2021; Daniel Tyler answer due 8/9/2021. (cjs)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul D. Ellington. Paul D. Ellington waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (McLean, Ian) Modified on 6/15/2021 to reflect correct party executing waiver, waiver sent and answer due dates (cjs).
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Tyler. Daniel Tyler waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021 (McLean, Ian) Modified on 6/15/2021 to reflect correct party executing waiver, waiver sent and answer due dates (cjs).
June 9, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 #5 #6 Notices of Direct Assignment. Filed as to wrong parties. Clerk's office restricted access. (jb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/22/2021. (jb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Daniel Tyler. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/22/2021. (jb) Modified on 6/9/2021 to restrict access. (jb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Paul D. Ellington. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/22/2021. (jb) Modified on 6/9/2021 to restrict access. (jb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Erik Rod. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/22/2021. (jb) Modified on 6/9/2021 to restrict access. (jb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paul D. Ellington, Erik Rod, Daniel Tyler. (jb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C - Proof of Loss re #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Death Certificate)(jb)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul D. Ellington, Erik Rod, Daniel Tyler (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000696) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy No. FLX-964841, #2 Exhibit B - Policy No. OK-66450, #3 Exhibit E - Register of Actions, #4 Exhibit F - Correspondence from Mark V. Larson, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Insurance Company of North America v. Rod et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Ellington
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Tyler
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Rod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Represented By: James Brodzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?