WPX Energy Williston LLC v. Fettig et al
Plaintiff: WPX Energy Williston LLC
Defendant: Gabriel Fettig, Howard Fettig, Charles Fettig, Morgen Fettig, B. J. Jones, Hon., Three Affiliated Tribes District Court and Honorable B. J. Jones
Case Number: 1:2021cv00145
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #20 Memorandum. Clerk's Office added more complete description to exhibit. (mf)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by B. J. Jones, Three Affiliated Tribes District Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of the Tribe's Law and Order Code)(Breuer, Peter) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/27/2021 to remove blank page) Regenerated NEF. Modified on 8/27/2021 to add exhibit description (mf)
August 26, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by B. J. Jones, Three Affiliated Tribes District Court. (Breuer, Peter)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim. Plaintiffs shall have until 9/13/2021 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the counterclaim asserted by the Fettigs. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 26, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: WPX Energy Williston LLC answer to counterclaim due 9/13/2021. (jb)
August 25, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim by WPX Energy Williston LLC. (Forward, Robin)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Morgen Fettig, Howard Fettig, Gabriel Fettig, Charles Fettig.(Soderstrom, Reed)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. B. J. Jones answer due on or before 8/26/2021; Three Affiliated Tribes District Court answer due on or before 8/26/2021. (LJH)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by B. J. Jones, Three Affiliated Tribes District Court. (Breuer, Peter) (Main Document 14 replaced on 8/3/2021 to include signature on document) Regenerated NEF (mf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Breuer on behalf of B. J. Jones, Three Affiliated Tribes District Court (Breuer, Peter)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WPX Energy Williston LLC. B. J. Jones served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021 (Forward, Robin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WPX Energy Williston LLC. Three Affiliated Tribes District Court served on 7/22/2021, answer due 8/12/2021 (Forward, Robin)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by WPX Energy Williston LLC. (mf)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Morgen Fettig. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/2/2021. (js)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Howard Fettig. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/2/2021. (js)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gabriel Fettig. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/2/2021. (js)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Charles Fettig. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/2/2021. (js)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, filed by WPX Energy Williston LLC. Charles Fettig served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; Gabriel Fettig served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; Howard Fettig served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; Morgen Fettig served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021. (Forward, Robin)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to WPX Energy Williston LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/20/2021. (cjs)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles Fettig, Gabriel Fettig, Howard Fettig, Morgen Fettig, B. J. Jones, Hon, Three Affiliated Tribes District Court. (cjs)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Fettig, Gabriel Fettig, Howard Fettig, Morgen Fettig, B. J. Jones, Hon, Three Affiliated Tribes District Court (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000779) filed by WPX Energy Williston LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Right-of-way documents (Lead Woman), #2 Exhibit B-Right-of-way documents (Nancy Dancing Bull), #3 Exhibit C-Right-of-way documents (Sweet Grass Woman), #4 Exhibit D-Right-of-way documents (Skunk Creek), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WPX Energy Williston LLC v. Fettig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WPX Energy Williston LLC
Represented By: Robin Wade Forward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Fettig
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Fettig
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Fettig
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgen Fettig
Represented By: Reed Alan Soderstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. J. Jones, Hon.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Affiliated Tribes District Court
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable B. J. Jones
Represented By: Peter Breuer
Represented By: John Fredericks, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?