Bismarck Park Avenue Properties, L.L.P. v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bismarck Park Avenue Properties, L.L.P.
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00165
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 4/11/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Previously set before Judge Hovland) (BG)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Judge Daniel L. Hovland. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
September 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/24/2023 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days) (BG)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 6/17/2022. Discovery Motions due by 6/17/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/17/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/1/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 9/16/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 12/17/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 2/1/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/17/2021. Threshold Motions due by 12/17/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2022. (BG)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 9/17/2021. (BG)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Morley, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kasey D. McNary on behalf of Bismarck Park Avenue Properties, L.L.P. (McNary, Kasey)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Morley on behalf of Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Morley, Michael)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge in this case. (jb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (jb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Bismarck Park Avenue Properties, L.L.P.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/25/2021. (jb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/25/2021. (jb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Burleigh County, case number Not Assigned. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000892 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Letter from North Dakota Insurance Department, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Affidavit of Service)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bismarck Park Avenue Properties, L.L.P. v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bismarck Park Avenue Properties, L.L.P.
Represented By: Kasey D. McNary
Represented By: Morgan Lyn Croaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?