Fitch v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Morgan Fitch
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00181
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 5/2/2022 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 5/1/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bismarck Eagle Courtroom before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (5 days). (LC)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 5/23/2022. Discovery Motions due by 5/23/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/26/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/30/2022. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 10/28/2022. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 10/28/2022. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 11/27/2022. Join Additional Parties due by 11/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 11/29/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 7/25/2022. Dispositive Motions due on or before 11/17/2022.(LC)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 11/10/2021. (LC) Modified on 11/15/2021 to add "text only" to the docket entry. NEF regenerated (lf).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #8 Stipulation as to Remote Deposition Procedures filed by Morgan Fitch by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(LC)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION as to Remote Deposition Procedures by Morgan Fitch. (Miller, Joshua)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua N. Miller on behalf of Morgan Fitch (Miller, Joshua)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
October 15, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's Office added corporate party information. (cjs)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company for BNSF Railway Company. (Haws, Daniel) Modified on 10/15/2021 to add corporate party information (cjs).
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company.(Haws, Daniel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Fitch. BNSF Railway Company served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021 (LeNeave, Randal)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (jb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121001003) filed by Morgan Fitch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitch v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Fitch
Represented By: Randal W. LeNeave
Represented By: Paul A. Banker
Represented By: Joshua N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Daniel A. Haws
Represented By: Roland John Wells, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?