Brodal Farms, LTD v. Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Plaintiff: Brodal Farms, LTD
Defendant: Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00203
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
2 Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #10 Stipulation filed by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. Archer-Daniels-Midland Company shall have until 1/14/2022 to file a Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration. (MM)
December 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Replies due by 1/14/2022. (mf)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Serve and File Reply in Support of Defendant's Cross Motion to Compel Arbitration by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Kreuder, Christopher)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Brodal Farms, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lynn Brodal, #2 Exhibit A- Text Messages, #3 Exhibit B- Jan 7 Confirmation, #4 Exhibit C- Dec 2 Rayglen Email w Attach, #5 Exhibit D- Dec 4 Rayglen Email w Attach, #6 Exhibit E- Jan 20 ADM atty ltr to Brodal, #7 Exhibit F- Jan 20 ADM Reprint, #8 Exhibit G- Jan 26 Brodal atty ltr to ADM, #9 Exhibit H- Jan 28 ADM atty ltr to Brodal, #10 Exhibit I- Apr 1 ADM Invoice to Brodal, #11 Exhibit J- ADM Arbitration Packet)(Lautt, Steven) (Attachment 2 and 4 replaced on 12/13/2021 to remove overlapping headers) Clerk's Office added Exhibit letters to attachments. Regenerated NEF. (mf)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland Adopting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Brodal Farms, LTD. Plaintiff's response due on or before December 10, 2021.(LJH)
November 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Responses due by 12/10/2021 (mf)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Serve and File Response to Defendant's Cross Motion to Compel Arbitration by Brodal Farms, LTD. (Lautt, Steven)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Serve and File Response to Defendant's Cross Motion to Compel Arbitration by Brodal Farms, LTD. (Lautt, Steven) Modified on 11/23/2021 to restrict access. (jb)
November 23, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Clerk's office restricted access to document per request of filer. (jb)
November 17, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MEMORANDUM in Support. Clerks office added descriptions to attachments. (js)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and in Response to Motion for Termination of Arbitration filed by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harold Henderson, #2 Exhibit A - Arbitration Provisions, #3 Exhibit B - Email from H. Henderson to T. Torkelson dated 12/4/20 - Contract Confirmation, #4 Exhibit C - Canola Purchase Confirmation dated 12/2/20, #5 Exhibit D - Rayglens confirmation, #6 Exhibit E - Grain Trade Rule)(Bylund, Jacob) Modified on 11/17/2021 to add exhibit descriptions. (js)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Bylund, Jacob)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland for all further proceedings. Judge Daniel M. Traynor no longer assigned to the case. (kmk)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (CK)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company from Burke County District Court, Case Number 07-2021-cv-00041. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 122000117 filed by Archer-Daniels-Midland Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Defendant's Notice of Removal State Court, #4 Affidavit of Service)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brodal Farms, LTD v. Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brodal Farms, LTD
Represented By: Steven A. Lautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer-Daniels-Midland Company
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Represented By: Jacob D. Bylund
Represented By: Christopher A Kreuder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?