Skarphol et al v. Amerada Hess Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Diana Skarphol, Brian Hove, Kevin Hove, Jason Hove, Celeste Knudsen, Maynard Iverson, Marlene Friedt, Ione Schmidt, Elaine Iverson, Leon Iverson, Alan Iverson, Myron Iverson, David Iverson, Phyllis Iverson, Shana Iverson-Fried, Joann Enger, Susan Belden, Duane Simpson, Wanda Black, Yvonne Iverson, Ashley Iverson and Melody Iverson
Defendant: Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC and Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00228
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 13 OBJECTION re #11 Affidavit Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendants' Response to Motion to Remand by Diana Skarphol. (Weikum, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to to Remand in Response to Defendant's Response Brief in Opposition of Motion to Remand filed by Diana Skarphol. (Weikum, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Michael Frailey re #10 Response to Motion by Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Hess Corporation, Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Hess Corporation, Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 2/18/2022. (KC)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief Regarding Motion to Remand by Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Hess Corporation, Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC. (Eiken, Zachary)
January 31, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Motion to Remand. Modified entry to add additional filers Duane Simpson, Ione Schmidt, Celeste Knudsen, Shana Iverson-Fried, Yvonne Iverson, Phyllis Iverson, Myron Iverson, Melody Iverson, Maynard Iverson, Leon Iverson, Elaine Iverson, David Iverson, Ashley Iverson, Alan Iverson, Kevin Hove, Jason Hove, Brian Hove. Marlene Friedt, Joann Enger, Wanda Black, Susan Belden. Pursuant to Section XIII(B) of the Administrative Policy Governing Electronic Filing and Service any previously filed documents should not be attached if they are already on file but should be referred to in the pleading. Clerk's Office added descriptions and letters to exhibits, and removed blank pages and overlapping headers on the exhibits. (mf)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Diana Skarphol, Duane Simpson, Ione Schmidt, Celeste Knudsen, Shana Iverson-Fried, Yvonne Iverson, Phyllis Iverson, Myron Iverson, Melody Iverson, Maynard Iverson, Leon Iverson, Elaine Iverson, David Iverson, Ashley Iverson, Alan Iverson, Kevin Hove, Jason Hove, Brian Hove. Marlene Friedt, Joann Enger, wanda Black, Susan Belden . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Removal, Remand, and reimbursement Under Rule 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c), #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum and Order (4:14-cv-1462) , #3 Exhibit C - Report and Recommendation (1:15-cv-45), #4 Exhibit D - Order Adopting Report and Recommendation (1:15-cv-45), #5 Exhibit E - Demand for Change of Judge (53-2021-cv-01372), #6 Proposed Order)(Williams, Justin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/31/2022 to remove blank page) (Attachment 2, 3, 4, and 5 replaced on 1/31/2022 to remove overlapping headers) Modified on 1/31/2022 to add Exhibit numbers and descriptions to exhibits, and to add additional filers Duane Simpson, Ione Schmidt, Celeste Knudsen, Shana Iverson-Fried, Yvonne Iverson, Phyllis Iverson, Myron Iverson, Melody Iverson, Maynard Iverson, Leon Iverson, Elaine Iverson, David Iverson, Ashley Iverson, Alan Iverson, Kevin Hove, Jason Hove, Brian Hove. Marlene Friedt, Joann Enger, wanda Black, Susan Belden. NEF Regenerated (mf)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #5 Stipulation. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand due by 1/28/2022. Defendants' deadline to respond to Complaint is stayed in the interim. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Stay Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Hess Corporation, Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 1/14/2022. (LC)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Hess Corporation, Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC. (Forster, Paul)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Hess Corporation, Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Hess Midstream LP for Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC; Corporate Parent Hess Corporation for Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC.. (Forster, Paul)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amerada Hess Corporation, Hess Corporation, Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC, Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC from Williams County Court, case number 53-2021-CV-01372. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 122000249. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Demand for Jury Trial, #5 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Personal Service, #6 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of Personal Service, #7 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Assignment and Case Number, #8 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiffs' Demand for Change of Judge, #9 Exhibit 8 - Reassignment Order to Judge Rustad, #10 Exhibit 9 - Defendants' Demand for Change of Judge, #11 Exhibit 10 - Certificate of Service of Defendants Demand for Change of Judge, #12 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Appearance, #13 Exhibit 12 - Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance, #14 Exhibit 13 - Reassignment Order to Judge Johnson, #15 Exhibit 14 - Notice of Self-Disqualification of Judge Johnson, #16 Exhibit 15 - Reassignment Order to Judge Schmidt, #17 Exhibit 16 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #18 Exhibit 17 - Exhibit A to Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #19 Exhibit 18 - Certificate of Service of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skarphol et al v. Amerada Hess Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Skarphol
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hove
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hove
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hove
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Knudsen
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maynard Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Friedt
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ione Schmidt
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Iverson
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Iverson-Fried
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Enger
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Belden
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Simpson
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Black
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Iverson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Weikum
Represented By: Justin L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerada Hess Corporation
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Bakken Investments II, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Tioga Gas Plant, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?