Hoffman v. Deja Vu Pizza, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ashleigh Hoffman
Defendant: Deja Vu Pizza, LLC doing business as Papa John's Pizza, Northern Bay Pizza, LLC doing business as Papa John's Pizza, Harold Rose, Steve Ritchie, Timothy O'Hern, Sara Lewis, Doe Corporations 1-10 and John Doe 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv00006
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashleigh Hoffman. Deja Vu Pizza, LLC served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022; Harold Rose served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022 (Hubbard, Emily)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ashleigh Hoffman re #5 MOTION to Certify Class for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Proofs of Service)(Hubbard, Emily)
February 17, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION to Certify Class. Clerk's Office removed unnecessary 'exhibit' text at Attachment 1. (pb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective Action by Ashleigh Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashleigh Hoffman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Email Notice)(Hubbard, Emily) Modified to remove unnecessary 'exhibit' text at Attachment 1 on 2/17/2022 (pb).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Emily Hubbard. (jb)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emily Hubbard (Filing fee $150, ANDDC-2359572) by Ashleigh Hoffman. (Hubbard, Emily) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/11/2022 in a non-fillable .pdf format and docket text modified to add receipt number. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Deja Vu Pizza, LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, John Doe 1-10, Sara Lewis, Northern Bay Pizza, LLC, Timothy O'Hern, Steve Ritchie, Harold Rose. (sj)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deja Vu Pizza, LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, John Doe 1-10, Sara Lewis, Northern Bay Pizza, LLC, Timothy O'Hern, Steve Ritchie, Harold Rose (Filing fee $402, receipt number 322000118) filed by Ashleigh Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Join FLSA Action)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Deja Vu Pizza, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashleigh Hoffman
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Represented By: Emily Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deja Vu Pizza, LLC doing business as Papa John's Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Bay Pizza, LLC doing business as Papa John's Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy O'Hern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?