EZ Blockchain LLC v. Blaise Energy Power, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: EZ Blockchain LLC
Defendant: Blaise Energy Power, Inc. and Mark Wald
Case Number: 1:2022cv00023
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor Adopting #51 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EZ Blockchain LLC. This case is dismissed with prejudice. (CK) (Main Document 52 replaced on 12/5/2022 to correct error in document) (cjs). Regenerated on 12/5/2022 (cjs).
December 5, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (cjs)
December 1, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #50 MOTION TO DISMISS. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL at #51 . (sc)
November 30, 2022 Filing 51 STIPULATION of Dismissal by EZ Blockchain LLC. (sc)
November 30, 2022 Filing 50 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation to Dismiss by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael) Modified to restrict access, terminate motion, and remove judge association on 12/1/2022 (sc).
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents. Closing documents due 1/3/2023. (CK) Modified on 11/16/2022 to correct due date in docket text. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
November 15, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents. Closing documents due 11/17/2022. (CK)
October 18, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Closing Documents by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor Adopting #44 Stipulation Pursuant to Settlement of Agreed Order to Distribute Funds Held by Clerk filed by EZ Blockchain LLC.(CK)
October 4, 2022 Filing 44 STIPULATION Pursuant to Settlement of Agreed Order to Distribute Funds Held by Clerk by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor finding as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court has been advised this case has settled. (CK)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (Text Only) ORDER Re: Settlement. Closing documents due within 30 days of the date of this order by Judge Daniel M. Traynor. The Court has been advised the case has settled. (CK)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (Text Only) ORDER: The settlement conference set for 9/28/2022 is cancelled. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Previously set for 9/28/2022 at 9:00 AM) (BG)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order (Text Only) ORDER: Settlement Conference REset for 9/28/2022 at 09:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (Previously set in error as a Scheduling Conference)(mf)
September 7, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Raymond on behalf of EZ Blockchain LLC (Raymond, Dana)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
September 7, 2022 Filing 37 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Status Conference held on 9/7/2022 (BG)
August 30, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/7/2022 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Call-in instructions previously provided by email.(LC)
July 18, 2022 Filing 35 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Mid-Discovery Status Conference held on 7/18/2022. (BG)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 7/18/2022 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 33 replaced on 4/5/2022 to correct a typographical error.) Regenerated NEF. (jb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 6/20/2023 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (4 days) (BG)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 9/1/2022. Discovery Motions due by 7/15/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/1/2022. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/1/2023. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 2/28/2023. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 2/28/2023. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 4/1/2023. Join Additional Parties due by 4/30/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2022. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 10/1/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 11/1/2022. Threshold Motions due by 12/1/2022. (BG)
April 4, 2022 Filing 30 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2022. (BG)
March 31, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #29 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerk's Office added Exhibit number to description. (sj)
March 30, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Blaise Energy Power, Inc., Mark Wald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sample Complaint from Federal Court)(Kalil, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/31/2022 to a non-fillable PDF). Modified on 3/31/2022 to add Exhibit number to description. (sj).
March 24, 2022 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT (joint) by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael)
March 17, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference REset for 4/4/2022 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Previously set for 3/18/2022). (LC)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #25 Motion to Continue (LC)
March 17, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Blaise Energy Power, Inc., Mark Wald. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Thomas E. Kalil in Support of Defendants Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference)(Kalil, Thomas)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor Amending Subparagraph 5 on Page 18 of #20 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (CK)
March 15, 2022 Filing 23 Affidavit of Ownership re: Bond received re #20 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by EZ Blockchain LLC. (sj)
March 9, 2022 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim for Failure to State a Claim filed by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2022 to add text. (sj).
March 9, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim #8 for Failure to State a Claim by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2022 to add link. NEF Regenerated. (sj).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (CK)
March 2, 2022 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Kozlowski Concerning Plaintiff's North Dakota Business Registration by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Approval, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Kozlowski, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced to remove overlapping header on 3/3/2022. NEF regenerated) (pb).
March 1, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Daniel M. Traynor: Motion Hearing held on 3/1/2022 re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Court Reporter KK) (rm)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor extending #12 Order for TRO. The TRO shall remain in effect until such time as the Court rules on Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction but not to exceed fourteen additional days. (CK)
February 23, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mark Wald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Broussard, #2 Declaration of Dylan Pokorny, #3 Declaration of Mark Wald, #4 Exhibit A- MSA, #5 Exhibit B- Messages Addressing Data Center Issues, #6 Exhibit C- Email RE: Moving Miners)(Kalil, Thomas)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
February 16, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Blaise Energy Power, Inc., Mark Wald. See Document #11 (mf)
February 16, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2022 at 09:00 AM in by telephone before Judge Daniel M. Traynor (1 hour). To call in, follow instructions at paragraph 30(2) in Doc. No. #12 . (CK)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Daniel M. Traynor granting #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Dismiss. (CK)
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Blaise Energy Power, Inc., Mark Wald. (Attachments: #1 Defendants Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Mark Wald, #3 Exhibit A - ND Secretary of State Search)(Kalil, Thomas) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/17/2022 to remove overlapping headers) Regenerated NEF. Modified on 2/17/2022 to add exhibit letter to attachment 3 (mf)
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EZ Blockchain LLC. Mark Wald served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022 (Purdon, Timothy)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EZ Blockchain LLC. Blaise Energy Power, Inc. served on 2/14/2022, answer due 3/7/2022 (Purdon, Timothy)
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against EZ Blockchain LLC by Mark Wald, Blaise Energy Power, Inc..(Kalil, Thomas)
February 9, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's Office filed Motion for Preliminary Injunction at 7 . Re: #5 Memorandum in Support. Clerk's Office added additional link to document 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and removed double headers from Exhibit 1, 2, and 4. Re: #6 Certificate of Service. Clerk's Office added additional link to document 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (mf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by EZ Blockchain LLC. See document #4 . (mf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EZ Blockchain LLC re #5 MEMORANDUM in Support, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint, (Kozlowski, Michael) Modified on 2/9/2022 to add additional link (mf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, re 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sergii Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 - Lemma Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Vargas Decl., #4 Exhibit 4 - Walker Decl., #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice)(Kozlowski, Michael) (Attachment 1, 2, and 4 replaced on 2/9/2022 to correct double headers) Modified on 2/9/2022 to add additional link. NEF Regenerated (mf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Kozlowski, Michael)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Blaise Energy Power, Inc., Mark Wald. (mf)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blaise Energy Power, Inc., Mark Wald (Filing fee $402, receipt number 122000376) filed by EZ Blockchain LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Data Center, #3 Exhibit B - MSA, #4 Exhibit C - Summary Report, #5 Exhibit D - Orderly Cables, #6 Exhibit E - Service Entry Point, #7 Exhibit F - Ad Hoc (Blaise's Way))(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EZ Blockchain LLC v. Blaise Energy Power, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZ Blockchain LLC
Represented By: Michael Kozlowski, Jr
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Dana Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaise Energy Power, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Kalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wald
Represented By: Thomas E. Kalil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?