Shaw v. N.D.S.P.
Petitioner: Delvin Lamont Shaw
Respondent: N.D.S.P.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00047
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by N.D.S.P.. (Mahoney, Michael)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement by N.D.S.P.. (Mahoney, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (jb) Distributed on 3/28/2022. (jb)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Delvin Lamont Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/23/2022 to correct typographical errors.) Distributed and Regenerated NEF on 3/23/2022. (jb)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (BG) Distributed on 3/23/2022.(jb)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Delvin Lamont Shaw. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/5/2022. (mf) Distributed on 3/22/2022 (mf)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Delvin Lamont Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Delvin Lamont Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. N.D.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delvin Lamont Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: N.D.S.P.
Represented By: Michael T. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?