Kruger v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Jason Kruger
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Leslie D. Tritten
Case Number: 1:2022cv00062
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James Cottrell Graulich, III on behalf of All Defendants (Graulich, James)
May 13, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. Service dates and Answer due dates missing. Clerk's office restricted access and re-filed Summons Returned Executed at #4 and #5 . (jb)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Kruger. Ur M. Jaddou served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022; Leslie D. Tritten served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022; U.S. Attorney served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022; U.S. Attorney General served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022 (jb)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Kruger. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022(jb) Modified on 5/13/2022 to correct service and answer dates. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE EVENTS* SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Tritten, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service Garland, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service Jaddou, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service Chase)(Bunnell, Jessica) Modified on 5/13/2022 to restrict access. (jb)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Leslie D. Tritten, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mf)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Leslie D. Tritten (Filing fee $402, receipt number 122000562) filed by Jason Kruger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - I-130 Receipt Notice, #3 Exhibit B - I-130 Notice of Intent to Deny, #4 Exhibit C - I-130 Decision Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Appeal of I-130 Decision, #6 Exhibit E - Withdrawal of Appeal of I-130 Decision)(mf) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/12/2022 to remove overlapping headers) NEF Regenerated (mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruger v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Kruger
Represented By: Jessica Bunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: James Cottrell Graulich, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By: James Cottrell Graulich, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie D. Tritten
Represented By: James Cottrell Graulich, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?