Herrera v. MDU Resources Group
Plaintiff: Jesus M. Herrera
Defendant: MDU Resources Group doing business as Montana-Dakota Utilities Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00114
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by MDU Resources Group. (cjs)
August 2, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to MDU Resources Group. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/16/2022. (sj)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Previously set for 9/1/2022) (BG) Distributed on 8/2/2022 (mf)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter.(BG) Distributed on 8/2/2022 (mf)
August 1, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MDU Resources Group re #8 Answer to Complaint (Sanderson, Paul)
August 1, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by MDU Resources Group.(Sanderson, Paul)
July 18, 2022 Filing 7 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jesus M. Herrera. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/25/2022. (jb)
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus M. Herrera. MDU Resources Group served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022 (mf) Distributed on 7/13/2022 (mf)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MDU Resources Group. (jb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against MDU Resources Group (Filing fee IFP) filed by Jesus M. Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Mailing Envelope)(jb)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (BG) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/5/2022 to correct case number.) Regenerated NEF and Distributed on 7/5/2022. (jb)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jesus M. Herrera. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/15/2022. (jb)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesus M. Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Mailing Envelope)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. MDU Resources Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus M. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDU Resources Group doing business as Montana-Dakota Utilities Company
Represented By: Paul R. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?