Colton v. Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Gregg B. Colton
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc. and Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00123
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Strike Class Allegations. Replies due by 9/29/2022. (JO)
September 9, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Class Allegations by Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc., Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.. (Forster, Paul)
September 9, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #26 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerk's Office replaced exhibit 1 to remove overlapping headers and added exhibit description. (sj)
September 8, 2022 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Class Allegations filed by Gregg B. Colton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Doc. No. 126, Opinion, from U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma) (Barton, George) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/9/2022 to remove overlapping headers). (sj). Modified on 9/9/2022 to add exhibit description (sj).
August 30, 2022 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Class Allegations filed by Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc., Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.. (Forster, Paul)
August 30, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike Class Allegations by Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc., Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.. (Forster, Paul)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
August 11, 2022 Filing 22 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc., Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P. (mf)
August 8, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (jb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (jb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (jb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (jb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (jb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (jb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/22/2022. (jb)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until 8/30/2022 to file answers or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. (BG)
August 8, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc., Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.. (Forster, Paul)
July 28, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg B. Colton. Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
July 28, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg B. Colton. Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
July 28, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg B. Colton. Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg B. Colton. Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg B. Colton. Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
July 28, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg B. Colton. Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
July 28, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg B. Colton. Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P. served on 7/25/2022, answer due 8/15/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth K Jones on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jones, Seth)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gregg B. Colton. (jb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gregg B. Colton. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/2/2022. (jb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc., Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.. (jb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P., Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC, Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P., Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc., Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000180) filed by Gregg B. Colton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Revenue Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colton v. Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg B. Colton
Represented By: Stacy Burrows
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Seth K Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources GP V, L.P.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources III-A GP, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources III-A, L.P.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources IV-A GP, LLC
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources IV-A, L.P.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources Operating Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lime Rock Resources V-A, L.P.
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?