Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC v. Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation
Plaintiff: Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC
Defendant: Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00138
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Class Allegations filed by Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation. (Forster, Paul)
October 17, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike Class Allegations by Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation. (Forster, Paul)
September 26, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Amended Complaint. Clerk's Office removed duplicate "Exhibit" language from docket text. (mf)
September 23, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation filed by Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sample Royalty Check Stub)(Barton, George) Modified on 9/26/2022 to remove duplicate "Exhibit" reference (mf)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant shall have until 10/17/2022 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (BG)
September 13, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation. (Forster, Paul)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (mf)
September 13, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. (mf)
September 12, 2022 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/19/2022. (mf)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC served on 8/26/2022, answer due 9/16/2022 (Burrows, Stacy)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/7/2022. (cjs)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation. (cjs)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000282) filed by Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Payment Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC v. Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hystad Ceynar Minerals, LLC
Represented By: George A Barton
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Seth K Jones
Represented By: Stacy Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiting Oil and Gas Corporation
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Forster
Represented By: Ragan Naresh
Represented By: Zachary R. Eiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?