Fick v. Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marthinus Fick
Defendant: Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC, Hiland Crude, LLC and W.C. Striegel, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00007
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines. Two business days prior to the Final Pretrial Conference, counsel must email the Final Pretrial Statement; Exhibit List and Witness List for each party; and Expert Reports to: ndd_J-Hochhalter@ndd.uscourts.gov. Trial Memorandum due at least 7 days prior to trial. Deposition designations due at least 14 days prior to trial. Additional deposition designations by opposing parties due 7 days prior to trial. Objections to deposition designations due 4 days prior to trial. Jury Instructions due at least 7 days prior to trial. Motions in limine due 30 days prior to trial. Additional deadlines and details contained in the Order. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2024 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/15/2023 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
March 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 12/9/2024 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel M. Traynor. (5 Days) (BG) Modified on 3/8/2023 to add number of days. Regenerated NEF (mf)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. Discovery due by 12/22/2023. Discovery Motions due by 1/31/2024. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/1/2024. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/1/2024. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 8/2/2024. Join Additional Parties due by 11/1/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2023. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 5/31/2024. Nondispositive Motions due by 5/31/2024. Threshold Motions due by 7/15/2024. (BG)
March 8, 2023 Filing 15 (Text Only) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter: Scheduling Conference held on 3/8/2023. (BG)
March 1, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney A. Presthus on behalf of Hiland Crude, LLC, Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC (Presthus, Courtney)
February 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference REset for 3/8/2023 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Previously set for 3/1/2023). (LC)
February 27, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelby Larson on behalf of Marthinus Fick (Larson, Shelby)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER: Scheduling Conference REset for 3/1/2023 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (Previously set for 3/1/2023 at 9:00 AM) (BG)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
January 31, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by W.C. Striegel, Inc.. (Lawlyes, Matthew)
January 31, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by W.C. Striegel, Inc..(Lawlyes, Matthew)
January 27, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's Office modified entry to reflect Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC and Corporate Parents Hiland Partners Holdings LLC, Kinder Morgan Portland Operating LLC, Kinder Morgan Portland Intermediate Holdings II, LLC, Kinder Morgan Portland Holdings, LLC, and Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Hiland Crude, LLC (pb)
January 26, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiland Crude, LLC, Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC. identifying Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC and Corporate Parents Hiland Partners Holdings LLC, Kinder Morgan Portland Operating LLC, Kinder Morgan Portland Intermediate Holdings II, LLC, Kinder Morgan Portland Holdings, LLC, and Kinder Morgan, Inc. for Hiland Crude, LLC. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified to add Other Affiliate and Corporate Parents on 1/27/2023 (pb).
January 26, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Combined Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Hiland Crude, LLC, Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC.(Grant, Nicholas)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marthinus Fick. Hiland Crude, LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023 (Larson, Mark)
January 11, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marthinus Fick. Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023 (Larson, Mark)
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marthinus Fick. W.C. Striegel, Inc. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023 (Larson, Mark)
January 9, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hiland Crude, LLC, Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC, W.C. Striegel, Inc.. (jb)
January 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hiland Crude, LLC, Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC, W.C. Striegel, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000680) filed by Marthinus Fick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fick v. Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marthinus Fick
Represented By: Mark V. Larson
Represented By: Shelby Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan G.P., LLC
Represented By: Courtney A. Presthus
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiland Crude, LLC
Represented By: Courtney A. Presthus
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.C. Striegel, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P Lawlyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?