Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc. et al v. Garland et al
Plaintiff: Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., West Virginia, State of, North Dakota, State of, Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Kentucky, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of, NST Global, LLC doing business as SB Tactical, B&T USA, LLC and Richard Cicero
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The and Steven Dettelbach
Petitioner: Members of Congress
Amicus Curiae: Robert M. Miller, Ph.D.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00024
Filed: February 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Martin Torstensen, Jr on behalf of Montana, State of (Torstensen, Peter)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Complaint due 30 days after the Court resolves Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. (JO) Distributed to Amicus on 4/6/2023 (mf)
March 31, 2023 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland. (Pitz, Taylor)
March 31, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Kentucky, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, NST Global, LLC, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of Supplemental Authority (Obermeier, Stephen)
March 31, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #72 Notice of Supplemental Authority. Clerk's office added exhibit letter and added description for exhibit. (jb)
March 30, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland re #63 Response to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opinion)(Pitz, Taylor) Modified on 3/31/2023 to add exhibit letter and description. (jb)
March 21, 2023 Filing 71 AMENDED AMICUS BRIEF by Robert M. Miller, PhD. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(mf)
March 21, 2023 Filing 70 AMICUS BRIEF by Robert M. Miller, PhD. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - OMB Circular A-4, #3 Exhibit 2 - Executive Order 12866, #4 Exhibit 3 - Executive Order 13563, #5 Exhibit 4 - Table of Figures)(mf)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #67 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae and granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief as Amici Curiae. (JO) Distributed on 3/20/2023. (jb)
March 15, 2023 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Out-of-Time Amicus Brief by Robert M. Miller, PhD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
March 15, 2023 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Robert M. Miller, PhD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Amicus Brief Index, #3 Proposed Exhibit 1 - OMB Circular A-4, #4 Proposed Exhibit 2 - Executive Order 12866, #5 Proposed Exhibit 3 - Executive Order 13563, #6 Proposed Exhibit 4 - Table of Figures, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Mailing Envelope)(cjs)
March 13, 2023 Filing 66 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Kentucky, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, NST Global, LLC, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Jeff Creamer)(Obermeier, Stephen)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's reply shall not exceed twenty (20) pages. (SK)
March 9, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., NST Global, LLC. (Sand, Benjamin)
March 9, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: #49 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Modified docket text for clarity. Event was not refiled as SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA as it is filed correctly at document #58 . All answer due dates remain correct. (pb)
March 7, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #63 Response. Clerk's Office removed 'exhibit' reference from attachment. (mf)
March 6, 2023 Filing 63 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William J. Ryan)(Pitz, Taylor) Modified on 3/7/2023 to remove 'exhibit' reference (mf)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #59 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. (MM)
February 28, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Short on behalf of Louisiana, State of (Short, Tracy)
February 28, 2023 Filing 60 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Short on behalf of Louisiana, State of (Short, Tracy) Modified on 2/28/2023 to restrict access. (jb)
February 28, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #60 Notice of Appearance. Wrong document attached. Clerk's office restricted access to document per request of filer. (jb)
February 27, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Members of Congress. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Weir, Bryan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The; Steven Dettelbach; Merrick B. Garland; United States Attorney for the District of North Dakota served on 2/13/2023, answer due 4/14/2023. (sc)
February 27, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Brungard on behalf of Louisiana, State of (Brungard, Morgan)
February 27, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #55 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA at #58 . (sc)
February 26, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Iowa, State of, Kansas, State of, Kentucky, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, South Dakota, State of, Tennessee, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Plaintiff States' Notice of Joinder in Preliminary Injunction) (Williams, Michael)
February 24, 2023 Filing 55 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., Richard Cicero, NST Global, LLC, B&T USA, LLC. All Defendants (Sand, Benjamin) Modified on to restrict access 2/27/2023 (sc).
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas M. Johnson, Jr. (mf)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan Weir. (sj)
February 24, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bryan Weir (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2614260) by Members of Congress. (Weir, Bryan) Modified on 2/24/2023 to add receipt number. (sj).
February 24, 2023 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas M. Johnson, Jr. (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2614215) by B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., NST Global, LLC. (Johnson, Thomas) (Main Document 51 replaced on 2/24/2023 to remove fillable PDF format). Modified on 2/24/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
February 23, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Scott St. John on behalf of Louisiana, State of (St. John, Joseph)
February 22, 2023 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., Richard Cicero, NST Global, LLC, B&T USA, LLC. United States Attorney served on 2/13/2023. (Sand, Benjamin) Modified to correct party served on 3/9/2023 (pb).
February 22, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edmond Brasington on behalf of Alaska, State of (Brasington, Charles)
February 22, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Silletto on behalf of Kentucky, State of (Silletto, Aaron)
February 22, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth B Murrill on behalf of Louisiana, State of (Murrill, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #27 NOTICE of Appearance. Clerk's Office replaced with non-fillable.pdf and regenerated the NEF; re: #28 RESPONSE to Motion. Clerk's Office added exhibit letter to attachment and removed filers not yet appeared at time of filing (Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Iowa, State of, Kentucky, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Carolina, State of, Tennessee, State of, and West Virginia, State of). (pb)
February 21, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Michael Gallagher on behalf of Virginia, State of (Gallagher, Kevin)
February 21, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by James Emory Smith, Jr on behalf of South Carolina, State of (Smith, James)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles Edmond Brasington. (jb)
February 20, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Christmas on behalf of Florida, State of (Christmas, Natalie)
February 17, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Hamilton on behalf of Nebraska, State of (Hamilton, Eric)
February 17, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon F. Chase on behalf of New Hampshire, State of (Chase, Brandon)
February 17, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H Wessan on behalf of Iowa, State of (Wessan, Eric)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin L. Matheny. (sj)
February 17, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark Lassiter Hildabrand on behalf of Tennessee, State of (Hildabrand, Clark)
February 17, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff P. Johnson on behalf of Missouri, State of (Johnson, Jeff)
February 17, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Justin L. Matheny (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2610230) by Mississippi, State of. (Matheny, Justin) Modified on 2/17/2023 to add receipt number. (sj).
February 17, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen John Petrany on behalf of Georgia, State of (Petrany, Stephen)
February 17, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Divine on behalf of Missouri, State of (Divine, Joshua) (Main Document 33 replaced on 2/21/2023 to non-fillable PDF). NEF Regenerated. (sj).
February 16, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Brian Corrigan on behalf of Montana, State of (Corrigan, Christian)
February 16, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles Edmond Brasington (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2609894) by Alaska, State of. (Brasington, Charles) Modified on 2/17/2023 to add receipt number. (jb)
February 16, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund G. LaCour, Jr on behalf of Alabama, State of (LaCour, Edmund)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 3/6/2023); granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Response shall not exceed 40 pages) (SK)
February 16, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Alabama, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Kansas, State of, Montana, State of, NST Global, LLC, Oklahoma, State of, South Dakota, State of, Utah, State of, Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Courtesy Email 02.10.2023)(Obermeier, Stephen) Modified to add exhibit letter on 2/21/2023 (pb). Modified to remove filers not yet appeared (Florida, State of, Georgia, State of, Iowa, State of, Kentucky, State of, Louisiana, State of, Mississippi, State of, Nebraska, State of, New Hampshire, State of, North Dakota, State of, South Carolina, State of, Tennessee, State of, and West Virginia, State of) on 2/22/2023 (pb).
February 16, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of Arkansas, State of (Jacobs, Dylan) (Main Document 27 replaced with non-fillable .pdf on 2/21/2023. NEF regenerated) (pb).
February 16, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey A Weaver on behalf of Oklahoma, State of (Weaver, Audrey)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David M. S. Dewhirst. (mf)
February 16, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 3/6/2023 (mf)
February 16, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages at 26 . (sc)
February 16, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #8 MOTION for Oral Argument. Modified entry to reflect correct filer: B&T USA, LLC; Richard Cicero; Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc.; and NST Global, LLC, West Virginia, State of. Removed all other plaintiffs as filers. (sc) Modified on 2/17/2023 to include West Virginia, State of. (rh)
February 15, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland. See document #22 . (sc) Modified on 2/16/2023 to terminate motion and judge association (cjs).
February 15, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2608969) by Idaho, State of. (Dewhirst, David) (Main Document 23 replaced on 2/15/2023 to remove fillable PDF format) NEF regenerated Modified on 2/15/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
February 15, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland. (Pitz, Taylor)
February 15, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Burris on behalf of Kansas, State of (Burris, Jesse)
February 15, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Pitz on behalf of All Defendants (Pitz, Taylor)
February 15, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew N. Ferguson on behalf of Virginia, State of (Ferguson, Andrew)
February 15, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Jordan Minot on behalf of Virginia, State of (Minot, Martin)
February 14, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Paul West on behalf of Oklahoma, State of (West, Zachary)
February 14, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Garry M. Gaskins, II on behalf of Oklahoma, State of (Gaskins, Garry)
February 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. McGuigan on behalf of South Dakota, State of (McGuigan, Charles)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Betsy M. DeNardi. (mf)
February 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Schelhaas on behalf of Wyoming, State of (Schelhaas, Ryan)
February 14, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Betsy DeNardi (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2607530) by Indiana, State of. (DeNardi, Betsy) Modified on 2/14/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
February 14, 2023 Filing 11 *RESTRICTED - ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED* NOTICE of Appearance by James Emory Smith, Jr on behalf of South Carolina, State of (Smith, James) Modified on 2/14/2023 to restrict access to document (mf)
February 14, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 Notice of Appearance. Attorney needs to follow the instructions on filing a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice or apply for full admission to our courts, which can be found on our website at www.ndd.uscourts.gov (mf)
February 13, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Holyoak on behalf of Utah, State of (Holyoak, Melissa)
February 13, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 COMPLAINT. Clerk's office replaced attachment 19 to remove overlapping headers and add more complete description to attachment. (sc)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron J. Silletto. (sc)
February 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Oral Argument by B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., NST Global, LLC. (Obermeier, Stephen) Modified to reflect correct filer on 2/16/2023 (sc).
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., NST Global, LLC., West Virginia, State of (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(Obermeier, Stephen) Modified to reflect correct filer on 2/16/2023 (sc). Modified on 2/17/2023 to add West Virginia as a filer. (rh)
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2605448) by Kentucky, State of. (Silletto, Aaron) Modified to add receipt number on 2/10/2023 (sc).
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Brief in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Response not to exceed 40 pages. (MM)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mf)
February 9, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by B&T USA, LLC, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., NST Global, LLC. (Sand, Benjamin)
February 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by B&T USA, LLC, Richard Cicero, Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., NST Global, LLC. (Sand, Benjamin)
February 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The, Steven Dettelbach, Merrick B. Garland (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000790) filed by Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc., Richard Cicero, NST Global, LLC, B&T USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Rule (Part 1), #3 Exhibit A - Rule (Part 2), #4 Exhibit A - Rule (Part 3), #5 Exhibit B - Regulatory Analysis, #6 Exhibit C - Platforms Adjudication, #7 Exhibit D - Firearms Adjudication, #8 Exhibit E - Comments of SB Tactical and FRAC, #9 Exhibit F - Comments of Richard Cicero, #10 Exhibit G - Declaration of Jeff Creamer, #11 Exhibit H - Declaration of Irving Luce, #12 Exhibit I - Declaration of Travis White, #13 Exhibit J - Declaration of Richard Cicero, #14 Exhibit K - Hurst Report, #15 Exhibit L - FTB Letter 2013-0172 (Nov. 26, 2012), #16 Exhibit M - FTB Letter 301737 (Mar. 5, 2014), #17 Exhibit N - ATF Letter 304296 (Dec. 22, 2015), #18 Exhibit O - 2015 Open Letter, #19 Exhibit P - USA v Kamali Transcript: Sentencing Hearing 9/24/2019, #20 Exhibit Q - ATF Letter 5000 (Mar. 21, 2017), #21 Exhibit R - Senate Letter, #22 Exhibit S - SBA3 Preliminary Classification Response, #23 Exhibit T - Kendall Report)(mf) (Attachment 19 replaced to remove overlapping headers on 2/13/2023) (sc). Modified to replace document and add more complete attachment descriptions to [1-19] on 2/13/2023 (sc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc. et al v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Regulatory Accountability Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Boyd Garriott
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Broggi
Represented By: Michael Faucette
Represented By: Stephen Obermeier
Represented By: Thomas M Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Michael Ray Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota, State of
Represented By: Drew H. Wrigley
Represented By: James E. Nicolai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama, State of
Represented By: Edmund G. LaCour, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska, State of
Represented By: Charles Edmond Brasington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida, State of
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia, State of
Represented By: Stephen John Petrany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho, State of
Represented By: David M.S. Dewhirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Represented By: Betsy M DeNardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iowa, State of
Represented By: Eric H Wessan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Jesse Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky, State of
Represented By: Aaron J. Silletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana, State of
Represented By: Elizabeth B Murrill
Represented By: Joseph Scott St. John
Represented By: Tracy Short
Represented By: Morgan Brungard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi, State of
Represented By: Justin L. Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of
Represented By: Jeff P. Johnson
Represented By: Joshua Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Peter Martin Torstensen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, State of
Represented By: Eric Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire, State of
Represented By: Brandon F. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Represented By: Garry M. Gaskins, II
Represented By: Audrey A Weaver
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota, State of
Represented By: Charles D. McGuigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee, State of
Represented By: Clark Lassiter Hildabrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah, State of
Represented By: Melissa Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia, State of
Represented By: Andrew N. Ferguson
Represented By: Kevin Michael Gallagher
Represented By: Martin Jordan Minot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: Ryan Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NST Global, LLC doing business as SB Tactical
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Broggi
Represented By: Michael Faucette
Represented By: Boyd Garriott
Represented By: Stephen Obermeier
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Thomas M Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B&T USA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Obermeier
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Boyd Garriott
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Broggi
Represented By: Michael Faucette
Represented By: Thomas M Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cicero
Represented By: Stephen Obermeier
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sand
Represented By: Boyd Garriott
Represented By: Jeremy Joseph Broggi
Represented By: Michael Faucette
Represented By: Thomas M Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick B. Garland
Represented By: Jody D. Lowenstein,
Represented By: Faith Lowry
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Represented By: Taylor Pitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, The
Represented By: Jody D. Lowenstein
Represented By: Taylor Pitz
Represented By: Faith Lowry
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dettelbach
Represented By: Jody D. Lowenstein,
Represented By: Faith Lowry
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Represented By: Taylor Pitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Members of Congress
Represented By: Bryan K. Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Robert M. Miller, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?