Redding v. Kenmare Public School et al
Plaintiff: Allen Redding
Defendant: Kenmare Public School, Alex Hennix and Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 1:2023cv00025
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Alex Hennix. (cjs)
March 7, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Kenmare Public School. (cjs)
February 23, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Allen Redding. (mf)
February 22, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alex Hennix. Alex Hennix waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Gaustad, Daniel)
February 22, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kenmare Public School. Kenmare Public School waiver sent on 2/22/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. (Gaustad, Daniel)
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Alex Hennix. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/7/2023. (jb)
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kenmare Public School. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/7/2023. (jb)
February 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Gaustad on behalf of Alex Hennix, Kenmare Public School (Gaustad, Daniel)
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Allen Redding. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/24/2023. (jb)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Doe Defendants 1-20, Alex Hennix, Kenmare Public School. (jb)
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe Defendants 1-20, Alex Hennix, Kenmare Public School (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000791) filed by Allen Redding. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redding v. Kenmare Public School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Redding
Represented By: Keith Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenmare Public School
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Hennix
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?