ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C. v. Midway Machining, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C.
Defendant: Midway Machining, Inc. and Dakota Fluid Power, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00044
Filed: March 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C.. (King, Lawrence)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
April 21, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dakota Fluid Power, Inc., Midway Machining, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SBP Holding LP for Dakota Fluid Power, Inc., Midway Machining, Inc... (Morris, Christopher)
April 21, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dakota Fluid Power, Inc., Midway Machining, Inc..(Morris, Christopher)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Judge Daniel L. Hovland, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge. (jb)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C.. (jb)
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/3/2023. (cjs)
March 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dakota Fluid Power, Inc., Midway Machining, Inc.. (cjs)
March 9, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/23/2023. (cjs)
March 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dakota Fluid Power, Inc., Midway Machining, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000885) filed by ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C. v. Midway Machining, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONEOK Rockies Midstream, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lawrence E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midway Machining, Inc.
Represented By: Mark David Covin
Represented By: Christopher R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Fluid Power, Inc.
Represented By: Mark David Covin
Represented By: Christopher R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?