Hogan v. Zuger Kirmis & Smith, PLLP et al
Plaintiff: Christine Hogan
Defendant: Zuger Kirmis & Smith, PLLP and Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00047
Filed: March 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 ERISA - Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation re #7 Stipulation filed by Standard Insurance Company. Defendant Standard Insurance Company shall have until 5/16/2023 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (LC)
May 5, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Standard Insurance Company answer due 5/16/2023. (mf)
May 4, 2023 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint for Extension of Time for Defendant Standard Insurance Company to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
May 4, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Standard Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company for Standard Insurance Company.. (Herring, Jacqueline)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J. Herring on behalf of Standard Insurance Company (Herring, Jacqueline)
April 11, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christine Hogan. Zuger Kirmis & Smith, PLLP waiver sent on 3/10/2023, answer due 5/9/2023. (O'Keeffe, Timothy)
April 11, 2023 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christine Hogan. Standard Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/10/2023, answer due 5/9/2023. (O'Keeffe, Timothy)
March 10, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company, Zuger Kirmis & Smith, PLLP. (mf)
March 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company, Zuger Kirmis & Smith, PLLP (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000892) filed by Christine Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogan v. Zuger Kirmis & Smith, PLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Hogan
Represented By: Timothy M. O'Keeffe
Represented By: Sara M. Monson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuger Kirmis & Smith, PLLP
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?