A. v. 26th Street Hospitality, LLP
Plaintiff: K. A.
Defendant: 26th Street Hospitality, LLP doing business as Mainstay Suites Williston
Case Number: 1:2023cv00092
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Clare R Hochhalter
Referring Judge: Daniel L Hovland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 26th Street Hospitality, LLP. (Hughes, John)
June 30, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by 26th Street Hospitality, LLP. (Hughes, John)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER adopting #5 Stipulation to Extend Time for 26th Street Hospitality, LLP d/b/a Mainstay Suites Williston to Respond to the Complaint. Response due by 6/30/2023. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
May 26, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time for 26th Street Hospitality, LLP d/b/a Mainstay Suites Williston to Respond to the Complaint by 26th Street Hospitality, LLP. (Hughes, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Besse McDonald on behalf of 26th Street Hospitality, LLP (McDonald, Besse)
May 25, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Hughes on behalf of All Defendants (Hughes, John)
May 12, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 26th Street Hospitality, LLP. (cjs)
May 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 26th Street Hospitality, LLP (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001099) filed by K. A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A. v. 26th Street Hospitality, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. A.
Represented By: Christopher Redmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 26th Street Hospitality, LLP doing business as Mainstay Suites Williston
Represented By: Besse McDonald
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?